This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 14:26:16 (UTC).

DEWITT, JANELLE A. VS. LOGUE, ROBERT W.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2008 DEWITT, JANELLE A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOGUE, ROBERT W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JANE GODFREY, MARK LUEVANO and JOHN T. RAFFERTY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1151

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JANE GODFREY

MARK LUEVANO

JOHN T. RAFFERTY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEWITT JANELLE A.

Defendant

LOGUE ROBERT W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/21/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S). FILED BY JANELLE A. DEWITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LOGUE, ROBERT W.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JANE GODFREY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 01/14/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO POSTPONE GRANTED. DEFENDANT HAS HAD STROKE. MATTER CONTINUED TO JANUARY 14, 2009 AT 1:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. CLERK TO SEND NOTICE AND ORDER TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (DEWITT, JANELLE A.) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 090 FOR CONSIDERATION MATTER WAS CONTINUED BY COURT . RECEIPT # LAWPAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LOGUE, ROBERT W.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. MARK LUEVANO PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 09/12/08 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 092 . DEFENDANT NON STIP TO PROTEM. MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 92 COMMISSIONER JOHN RAFFERTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 10/31/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (LOGUE, ROBERT W.) BY SUB-SERVING MID-THIRTIES WOMAN . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/12/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED 1ST FROM COURT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/12/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 08/01/08 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.