This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2016 at 20:46:58 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL VS MACIAS, LUIS

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MACIAS, LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0488

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL

Defendant

MACIAS LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E WEISS INCORPORATED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2009
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED(SHERIFF'S BASKET)JB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2008
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2008
  • JUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2008
  • RECEIVED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 50 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2008
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • MOTION FILED: FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT HEARING SET FOR 9/16/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • RESPONSE FILED * * VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.