This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:11:05 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS. VELARDE, SANTIAGO

Case Summary

On 02/10/2009 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VELARDE, SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ and HOWARD RUBIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0140

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ

HOWARD RUBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

NUNEZ VALENTIN CLAIMANT

VELARDE SANTIAGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON & ASSOCIATES, INC. - DOUG V. PHAM

Attorney at JACKSON & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. FORWARDED TO EL MONTE SHERIFF DEPARTMENT . RECEIPT # ELM478900020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 22.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. HOWARD RUBIN, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL AND DEFAULT PROVE-UP. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY: JAMES EDWARD MCDANIEL ESQ. . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/04/09 , FOR (DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY) AS TRUSTEE , AGAINST (VELARDE, SANTIAGO) , (NUNEZ, VALENTIN), CLAIMANT , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 16908 E MAIN ST, LA PUENTE, CA 91744 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL HAVING BEEN FILED ON 04/16/09 . MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 05/04/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (VELARDE, SANTIAGO) , AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY) AS TRUSTEE FOR REJECTION OF ENTRY OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT- A PREJUDGMENT WAS FILED ON 02-23-09 & A MOTION TO STRIKE ON 03-02-09 THEREFORE, DEFAULT ONLY WAS ENTERED AS TO SATIAGO VELARDE AND ALL OCCUPANTS. CASE IS SCHEDULED 03-27-09 AT SUBMITTED ON 03/05/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE TO COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # CRC 985 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/27/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CLAIMANT (NUNEZ, VALENTIN), CLAIMANT . . RECEIPT # WAIVER . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/23/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (NUNEZ, VALENTIN), CLAIMANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (NUNEZ, VALENTIN), CLAIMANT SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: IN WHOLE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM236112025.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less