Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2016 at 08:36:31 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS. PORTMAN, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 07/17/2009 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PORTMAN, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0049

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF

Defendants

PORTMAN WILLIAM

ELLIS RICK AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOUSER & ALLISON, APC - KATHERINE S. WALKER

Attorney at HOUSER & ALLISON, APC

Defendant Attorney

ZAKARI LAW, APC - RAYMOND ZAKARI

Attorney at ZAKARI LAW, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/27/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAY FORD, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. . SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 12/28/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 . COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE OSC TO THE ABOVE INDICATED DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (ELLIS, RICK) AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, IN THE SUM OF $ 6.00 FOR FAX VERIFICATION AND COPIES . RECEIPT # MAL472300001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DECLARATIONS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (ELLIS, RICK) AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (ELLIS, RICK) AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, . RECEIPT # MAL47230003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 5.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # MAL472300003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (ELLIS, RICK) AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, IN THE SUM OF $ 3.50 FOR FAX VERIFICATION . RECEIPT # MAL472300003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 11.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # MAL517212002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL472300003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - LIMITED CIVIL CASE FILED. COPY SENT TO PLAINTIFF AFTER FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAKARI RAYMOND V