This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 06:29:09 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS. ORTEGA, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 02/08/2008 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ORTEGA, RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0187

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

Defendant

ORTEGA RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE ENDRES LAW FIRM - DAVID R. ENDRES ESQ

Attorney at THE ENDRES LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/05/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/20/08 , FOR (DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE) , AGAINST (ORTEGA, RICHARD) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 27015 KARNS COURT UNIT 1109, CANYON COURT, CA 91387 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW240853011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS UNLAWFUL DETAINER, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION, APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS FILED. SERVED AS TO (ORTEGA, RICHARD) , ALL OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 123.88 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ORTEGA, RICHARD) , ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (ORTEGA, RICHARD) , ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 004 FOR CONSIDERATION. RN NEW253967008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW240853055.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less