This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:39:55 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS. LOPEZ, DELFINA

Case Summary

On 03/13/2009 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOPEZ, DELFINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0246

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

Defendant

LOPEZ DELFINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE ENDRES LAW FIRM - DAVID R. ENDRES

Attorney at THE ENDRES LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 08/20/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 07/23/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/19/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (LOPEZ, DELFINA) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: FILING PAPERS, CERTIFICATION AND COPYING, ISSUING PROCESS AND CERTIFICATION, TRANSMITTAL OF PAPERS, COURT-APPT INTERPR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (LOPEZ, DELFINA E.) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS;UD-EVICTION;COMPLAINT FOR UD;PREDJUDGMENT CLAIM; COVER SHEET;ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION; EXHIBITS FILED. SERVED AS TO (LOPEZ, DELFINA) . COSTS OF $ 102.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS-UD-EVICTION;COMPLAINT FOR UD;PREJUDGMENT CLAIM;COVER SHEET;ADDENDUM;STATEMENT OF LOCATION; EXHIBITS. FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (LOPEZ, DEFINA E.) . RECEIPT # CRC 985 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (LOPEZ, DELFINA E.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM478900003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.