This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2016 at 06:10:51 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK VS LOPEZMARTINEZ, LUIS A

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOPEZMARTINEZ, LUIS A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1422

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

LOPEZMARTINEZ LUIS A

SALAZAR ERIKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2010
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • OSC SET 02/23/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. 81, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.