This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2016 at 10:48:47 (UTC).

DEKERMENDJIAN, DIANA VS. LABADIE, SPENCER R.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2006 DEKERMENDJIAN, DIANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LABADIE, SPENCER R. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE J. MIRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0206

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAWRENCE J. MIRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEKERMENDJIAN DIANA

Defendant

LABADIE SPENCER R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANK J. IANNACCONE,INC - FRANK J. IANNACCONE ESQ

Attorney at FRANK J. IANNACCONE,INC

Defendant Attorney

SILVA A. CLASEN & RAFFALOW - YVONNE BIRCH ESQ

Attorney at SILVA A. CLASEN & RAFFALOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2008
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (LABADIE, SPENCER R.) . A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 03/15/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (DEKERMENDJIAN, DIANA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL HAVING BEEN FILED ON 12/26/06 . MATTER IS REFERRED TO MEDIATION BY ELECTION OF (LABADIE, SPENCER R.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. CLK , HON. LAWRENCE J. MIRA PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ONE OF THE PARTIES IS AMENABLE TO MEDIATION AND THE MATTER IS REFERRED. CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 05-07-07 AT 8:30AM IN DEPT. 1 FOR A POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE. PARTIES ARE MAILED ADR REFERRAL PACKAGE. CLERK'S OFFICE TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING ON 05/07/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (LABADIE, SPENCER R.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (LABADIE, SPENCER R.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • ANSWER FILED OF (LABADIE, SPENCER R.) . RECEIPT # MAL517212003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL136401002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 02/14/07 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/16/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.