This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 22:04:07 (UTC).

DARMIENTO III, FRANK R. VS. WILLIAMSON, ROOSEVELT

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 DARMIENTO III, FRANK R filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILLIAMSON, ROOSEVELT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAMELA A. DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2721

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAMELA A. DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARMIENTO III FRANK R.

Defendant

WILLIAMSON ROOSEVELT AKA WILLIAMSON R.J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - LAURENCE H. LISHNER ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 08U02721 TO SM 08R02721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 200.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 53.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY ATTORNEY, LAURENCE H. LISHNER . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER . JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT. STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT SIGNED THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2008
  • DEFAULT COURT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • RECEIVED ANSWER AND FEE WAIVER FOR ROOSEVELT WILLIAMNSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • ANSWER FILED OF (WILLIAMSON, ROOSEVELT) AKA (WILLIAMSON, R.J.) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (WILLIAMSON, ROOSEVELT) AKA (WILLIAMSON, R.J.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (WILLIAMSON, ROOSEVELT) AKA (WILLIAMSON, R.J.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM507623009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES OF HONORABLE PAMELA A. DAVIS .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.