This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 11:49:34 (UTC).

DANIELS AVENUE LIMITED VS SHAW, THERESA KATHRYN

Case Summary

On 03/06/2006 DANIELS AVENUE LIMITED filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHAW, THERESA KATHRYN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0207

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELS AVENUE LIMITED

Defendant

SHAW THERESA KATHRYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN, EDWARD L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2006
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2006
  • NSF RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2006
  • NSF - CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING FEES REQUIRED (MAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2006
  • NSF - CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING FEES REQUIRED (MAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • A/C - DEFAULT JDGMT BY CLERK #001 REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • JUDGMENT GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2006
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • MOTION FILED: MISCELLANEOUS MOTION HEARING SET FOR 4/06/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • A/C - MOTION FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS