Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2016 at 16:14:49 (UTC).

CZECH, JEFFERY J. VS ARREY, MONICA

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 CZECH, JEFFERY J filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARREY, MONICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMANDO V. MORENO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1075

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMANDO V. MORENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CZECH JEFFERY J. DBA JEFFERY J. CZECH & ASSOCIATES

Defendant

ARREY MONICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM WH 11S01075 TO DOW11SW1075

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY BOX . RECEIPT # WH0541556004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ARREY, MONICA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. ARMANDO V. MORENO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY DENISE D. EHRLE . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . COURT FINDS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) IS/ARE NOTIFIED TO APPEAR AS REQUIRED BY LAW. TRIAL PROCEEDS. JUDGMENT IS RENDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/12/11 . FOR (CZECH, JEFFERY J.) D.B.A.(JEFFERY J. CZECH & ASSOCIATES) . AGAINST (ARREY, MONICA) . PRINCIPAL $ 931.46 . COSTS $ 67.50 . TOTAL $ 998.96 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ARREY, MONICA) BY SUB-SERVING ISABEL PAVIOLO . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/12/11 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 COSTS OF $ 37.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN WH0541556002. HEARING SET FOR 12/12/11 AT 09:30 AM IN DPT. 006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO DENISE D. EHRLE FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less