This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 23:44:04 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC VS SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2011 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7251

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC

Defendant

SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J FREED

Defendant Attorney

PINES, DAVID A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2014
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $0452.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0158.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF ACCRUED COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0060.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 01/29/13 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 106

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2011
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • MOTION FILED: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTN HEARING SET FOR 10/25/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • MOTION FILED: MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROG HEARING SET FOR 10/25/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • OSC VACATED - RESPONSIVE PLEADING FILED; CASE SET FOR CMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • SUB SERV:7/7/11;CCP 416.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • CMR SET 01/03/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 106, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunland Wood Products, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant