Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 22:04:29 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU IN VS. BARNES, DAVID

Case Summary

On 05/17/2006 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU IN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BARNES, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LLOYD NASH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0662

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LLOYD NASH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

BARNES DAVID DBA STIX & STONES CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - KENNETH J FREED

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/10/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT PER CRC RULE 201.7(H) . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/19/07 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BARNES, DAVID) DBA (STIX & STONES CONSTRUCTION) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION/DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY LLOYD NASH, SITE JUDGE . MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PER CRC RULE 201.7(B). SHOULD PROOF OF SERVICE BE FILED PRIOR TO THE OSC, THE HEARING WILL BE PLACED OFF CALENDAR. . HEARING ON 11/17/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 004 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION/DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY LLOYD NASH, SITE JUDGE . MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY FILE A DEFAULT PER CRC RULE 201.7(G). SHOULD A DEFAULT BE FILED PRIOR TO THE OSC, THE HEARING WILL BE PLACED OFF CALENDAR. . HEARING ON 11/17/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 004 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS COMPLAINT ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKAGE NOT ICE OF CASE MANAGMENT REVIEW-LIMITED CIVIL; NOTICE TO LITIGA FILED. SERVED AS TO (BARNES, DAVID) DBA (STIX & STONES CONSTRUCTION) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • NOTICE RE: CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW477728010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/13/06 AT 08:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 05/26/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant