This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2016 at 20:56:54 (UTC).

COULSON, DAWN M. VS STECKBAUER WEINHART JAFFE, LLP

Case Summary

On 07/22/2009 COULSON, DAWN M filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STECKBAUER WEINHART JAFFE, LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8448

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COULSON DAWN M.

Defendant

STECKBAUER WEINHART JAFFE LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 012 , HON. BARBARA MEIERS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . MATTER TRANSFERRED FROM DEPARTMENT 90 FOR COURT TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (STECKBAUER WEINHART JAFFE, LLP) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/02/09 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • SUBPOENA AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO JEFFREY A. COHEN FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: BY MAIL FILED. SERVED AS TO (STECKBAUER WEINHART JAFFE, LLP) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT FILED BY (STECKBAUER WEINHART JAFFE, LLP) . MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/02/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . RECEIPT # LAC235337031 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC279625008. HEARING SET FOR 08/21/09 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STECKBAUER WEINHART JAFFE LLP is a litigant