Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2016 at 20:20:42 (UTC).

CORTEZ, OLGA RIVERA VS ROBLES, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 CORTEZ, OLGA RIVERA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBLES, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINA D. FRIED. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6091

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINA D. FRIED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTEZ OLGA RIVERA

Defendants

ALVARADO LETICIA

ROBLES JENNIFER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 08/13/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ . RECEIPT # XXX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. MINA D. FRIED PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROBLES, JENNIFER) BY SUB-SERVING LORAINA CERRITOS.O-OCCUPOANT AT RESIDENCE . COSTS OF $ 41.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALVARADO, LETICIA) BY SUB-SERVING LORAINA CERRITOS, CO-OCCUOANT AT RESIDENCE . COSTS OF $ 45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED /P001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/07/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • CLERK`S NOTICE SC-100 NEW HEARING DATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/10/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • CLERK`S NOTICE SC-100 NEW HEARING DATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED /P1 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 02/22/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (ROBLES, JENNIFER) FILED. COSTS OF $ 59.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV114541002 . HEARING SET FOR 12/22/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less