This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 09:19:30 (UTC).

CORREA, MIRNA RIOS VS. VANOUNOU CLOTHING, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2011 CORREA, MIRNA RIOS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VANOUNOU CLOTHING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2045

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORREA MIRNA RIOS DBA FASHION INSPIRATION A PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

VANOUNOU ZION

VANOUNOU MOSHE

VANOUNOU CLOTHING INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERKS NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (VANOUNOU CLOTHING, INC.) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (CORREA, MIRNA RIOS) DBA (FASHION INSPIRATION A PARTNERSHIP) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (VANOUNOU CLOTHING, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (CASE SETTLED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (VANOUNOU, ZION) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/12/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (VANOUNOU CLOTHING, INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/12/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (VANOUNOU, MOSHE) BY SUB-SERVING MOSHE VANOUNOU . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/12/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC277592007. HEARING SET FOR 04/12/11 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VANOUNOU CLOTHING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant