This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 14:45:53 (UTC).

CONTRERAS, ELIZABETH VS GALANG, TRISTAN

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 CONTRERAS, ELIZABETH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GALANG, TRISTAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0979

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTRERAS ELIZABETH

Defendant

GALANG TRISTAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM DOW08S00979 TO DOW08D00979

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 11/07/08 AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • ORDER APPOINTING (CONTRERAS, ELIZABETH) GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (MORA, MICHAEL XAVIER) FOR . , SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION{S} FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (CONTRERAS, ELIZABETH) GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (MORA, MICHAEL XAVIER) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT{S} PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: FILING PAPERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # FEE WVR . HEARING SET FOR 10/03/08 AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 1NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PETITION AND APPOINTMENT OF (CONTRERAS, ELIZABETH) GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (MORA, MICHAEL XAVIER) FOR MICHAEL MORA , RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (CONTRERAS, ELIZABETH) GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (MORA, MICHAEL XAVIER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (CONTRERAS, ELIZABETH) GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (MORA, MICHAEL XAVIER) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.