This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2019 at 22:33:07 (UTC).

COHEN, JOSEPH VS TZUR, AHARON RONI

Case Summary

On 06/29/2006 COHEN, JOSEPH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TZUR, AHARON RONI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ, SUPERVISING. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0563

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ, SUPERVISING

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN JOSEPH

Defendants

TZUR AHARON RONI

TZUR AHARON RONI AKA TSOUR RONI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AZEMA ESQ, DAVID M

AZEMA ESQ DAVID M

Defendant Attorneys

TSOUR, RONI

TSOUR RONI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2008
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2006
  • WRIT REJECTED: WRIT ISSUED ON 8/18/06 TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IS STILL WRIT REJECTED: Writ issued on 8/18/06 to Los Angeles County is still outstanding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2006
  • DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST OF $24.86 FILED DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST OF $24.86 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2006
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • WEST DISTRICT-WEST LOS ANGELES COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • Court convened on 08/03/06 at 0830AM and the following proceedings were had:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • ___________________________________

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • STIPULATION 06X00563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • appearing by attorney(s) AZEMA ESQ, DAVID M.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2006
  • DECLARATION OF JOSEPH COHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPH COHEN'S- DECLARATION OF JOSEPH COHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPH COHEN'S- MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID M. AZEMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPH COHEN'S- DECLARATION OF DAVID M. AZEMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPH COHEN'S- MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPHPH COHEN'S- REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JOSEPHPH COHEN'S- MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2006
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 4 HR(S) * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less