This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2018 at 05:27:15 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS. DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT, CO.I

Case Summary

On 01/20/2009 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT, CO I. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0131

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT CO.INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J. LOVE - FRANKLIN J. LOVE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J. LOVE

Defendant Attorney

CRAIG BORISON - CRAIG BORISON

Attorney at CRAIG BORISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/16/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • REQUEST RE: TO TAKE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, FILED BY PLAINTIFF, OFF CALENDAR RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # BH511014006 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/25/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/25/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 07/23/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT, CO.INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2009
  • REQUEST RE: FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO. ONE RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT, CO.INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT, CO.INC.) . RECEIPT # BH490068033 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT, CO.INC.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (DOMINO REALTY MANAGEMENT, CO.INC.) . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN BH016331021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE RICHARD A. STONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY RICHARD A. STONE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/24/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 006 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less