This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2016 at 21:07:48 (UTC).

CM REO TRUST VS BARRIOS, MARIA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 CM REO TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BARRIOS, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0659

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CM REO TRUST

Defendants

BARRIOS MARIA

SOSA JOHN DOE

SOSA JANE DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENTHAL, WITHEM & ZEFF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2014
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • OSC SET 08/30/11, 0830 AM, DEPT. CLK, RM 118 NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL/ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.