This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 09:26:17 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES MUNICIPAL VS. RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2010 CITY OF LOS ANGELES MUNICIPAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1997

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES MUNICIPAL CORPO

Defendant

RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. AGENT FOR SERVICE: JACK NOURASFSHAN . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/29/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN GOVT AGENCY. HEARING SET FOR 04/29/10 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant