This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:46:21 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE, INC VS. VILLALOBOZ, SOTERO J.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2009 CITIMORTGAGE, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VILLALOBOZ, SOTERO J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0272

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIMORTGAGE INC

Defendant

VILLALOBOZ SOTERO J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF LES ZIEVE - JAMES R. KNOLES ESQ

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF LES ZIEVE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/02/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/22/09 , FOR (CITIMORTGAGE, INC) , AGAINST (VILLALOBOZ, SOTERO J.) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 2973 LIBERTY BLVD., SOUTH GATE, CA 90280 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 100.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. *FWD TO SHERIFF DEPT* . RECEIPT # HPK538978037 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (VILLALOBOZ, SOTERO J.) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (VILLALOBOZ, SOTERO J.) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. MICHAEL J. PEARCE PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 05/12/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (VILLALOBOZ, SOTERO J.) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 002 FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # HPK478659005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/09/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK478659038.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.