This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 05:10:53 (UTC).

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA VS. TORRES JR, GABRIEL D

Case Summary

On 02/10/2010 CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TORRES JR, GABRIEL D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0446

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N.A.

Defendant

TORRES JR GABRIEL D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES - JANALIE HENRIQUES ESQ

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON07/26/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RECEIVED FROM THE POMONA NORTH COURTHOUSE ANDFILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT RE: RELOCATEDCASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION ASTO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • DocketSERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NOSERVICE AS TO (TORRES JR, GABRIEL D) FILED. COSTS OF $45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: DESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • DocketSERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NOSERVICE AS TO (TORRES JR, GABRIEL D) FILED. COSTS OF $45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RNPOM234074037.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE COMMR. ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNEDAND FILED BY COMMR. ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONSSHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OFSERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARINGON 08/16/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATEOF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citibank South Dakota NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE