This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 20:10:52 (UTC).

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA VS. ACUNA, BEATRICE Y

Case Summary

On 04/20/2009 CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACUNA, BEATRICE Y. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1404

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N.A.

Defendant

ACUNA BEATRICE Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES - JANALIE HENRIQUES ESQ

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/25/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (ACUNA, BEATRICE Y) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:11A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. COMMR. ANTHONY PETERS PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. PLAINTIFF APPEARING CHRISTIAN KIM, SPECIALLY APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: 05-17-10 CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CALENDAR DESK RE: CALENDARS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 04/15/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (ACUNA, BEATRICE Y) . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM240110032.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/22/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less