This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 11:38:35 (UTC).

CITIBANK, NA VS. MORALES, GILBERTO

Case Summary

On 04/20/2009 CITIBANK, NA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MORALES, GILBERTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN SEPASSI, LIA R. MARTIN and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0380

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN SEPASSI

LIA R. MARTIN

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA NOT INDIVIDUALLY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF B

Defendants

MENCIA ROSA

MORALES GILBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRETT DFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS - EDWARD A. TREDER

Attorney at BARRETT DFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. FORWARDED TO EL MONTE SHERIFF DEPARTMENT. . RECEIPT # ELM511049002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 50.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. COMM. LIA R. MARTIN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL AND DEFAULT PROVE-UP. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY: LUKE DANIELS ESQ. FOR EDWARD A. TREDER ESQ. . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/21/09 , FOR (CITIBANK, NA), NOT INDIVIDUALLY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF (BEAR STEARNS ASSET BACKED SECURITIES I TRUST 2006-HE4) , AGAINST (MORALES, GILBERTO) , (MENCIA, ROSA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1136 SAINT MALO AVENUE, LA PUENTE, CA 91744 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL HAVING BEEN FILED ON 11/30/09 . MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 12/21/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MENCIA, ROSA) , ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO STRIKE TO COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER. , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # CRC 985 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/02/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (MORALES, GILBERTO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (MORALES, GILBERTO) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 3.61 CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM236112013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.