This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2016 at 09:29:54 (UTC).

CITI RESIDENTIAL LENDING INC., VS. WHITFIELD, REOLA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 CITI RESIDENTIAL LENDING INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WHITFIELD, REOLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1738

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITI RESIDENTIAL LENDING INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendant

WHITFIELD REOLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DEBORAH BASS - DEBORAH M BASS ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DEBORAH BASS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED IN A TIMELY MANNER . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY WILLIAM R. CHIDSEY, JR. . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/12/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 00N . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: UD RETURNED AS TO ANY AND ALL DUE TO UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: UD RETURNED AS TO (WHITFIELD, REOLA) DUE TO UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 466510041.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.