This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2016 at 09:52:48 (UTC).

CHOU, GENE P VS. DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO

Case Summary

On 08/01/2008 CHOU, GENE P filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1789

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOU GENE P

Defendants

ED DEL ROSARIO AND ASSOCIATES INC.

DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO

LAYUG ROWENA V

SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • CASE FILE STORED IN BOX #11 SET FOR DESTRUCTION ON 09/28/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. DES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT INC.) BY SUB-SERVING MRS. BALA . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 8 RE: ON CALENDAR FOR 9-3-08 PM (NIGHT COURT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) BY SUB-SERVING MRS. BALA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/03/08 AT 04:30P M, IN DEPT. N08 COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ED DEL ROSARIO AND ASSOCIATES, INC.) BY SUB-SERVING MRS. BALA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/03/08 AT 04:30P M, IN DEPT. N08 COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAYUG, ROWENA V) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/03/08 AT 04:30P M, IN DEPT. N08 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # SBA510923004 . HEARING SET FOR 09/03/08 AT 04:30P M, IN DEPT. N08

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.