This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2016 at 23:23:09 (UTC).

CHASE BANK USA, N.A. VS. AGUDELO, LUIS C.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 CHASE BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AGUDELO, LUIS C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2970

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHASE BANK USA N.A. A CORPORATION

Defendant

AGUDELO LUIS C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JPMORGAN CHASE LEGAL DEPARTMENT - HUAN T NGUYEN

Attorney at JPMORGAN CHASE LEGAL DEPARTMENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE NORWALK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELM08C02970 TO NOR08CM2970

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CHASE BANK USA, N.A.) A CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. JUDGMENT WAS ALREADY ENTERED ON 2/18/09. SUBMITTED ON 03/16/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • ORDER ALLOWING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/18/09 . FOR (CHASE BANK USA, N.A.) A CORPORATION . AGAINST (AGUDELO, LUIS C.) . PRINCIPAL $ 16321.37 . ATTORNEY FEES $ .00 . INTEREST $ 523.18 . COSTS $ 341.00 . TOTAL $ 17,185.55 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS (MS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (AGUDELO, LUIS C.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND WAIVER OF EXCESS INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 3-12-09 IS HEREBY VACATED, MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 08/20/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED /GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT,ADR PKG,NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AGUDELO, LUIS C.) . COSTS OF $ 41.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM236112017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/12/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.