This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 09:36:20 (UTC).

CHAN, PETER VS. MAY, RYAN

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 CHAN, PETER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MAY, RYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0723

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAN PETER

Defendant

MAY RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN D. HECKMANN - BRIAN D. HECKMANN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN D. HECKMANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SHERIFF'S . RECEIPT # PAS009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 33.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MAY, RYAN) . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MAY, RYAN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/04/08 . FOR (CHAN, PETER) . AGAINST (MAY, RYAN) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 300 NORTH HOLLISTON AVENUE APT. 6, PASADENA, CA 91106 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS500511040.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.