Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 12:00:33 (UTC).

CENTURY WEST PROPERTIES VS DUKE, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 04/27/2006 CENTURY WEST PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DUKE, STEVEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0340

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTURY WEST PROPERTIES

Defendant

DUKE STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZKOLNIK, FRED M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2007
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2006
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2006
  • JUDGMENT GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2006
  • RETURNED MAIL OF NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER; ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2006
  • RETURNED MAIL OF NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER; RETURN TO SENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY WEST PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOLNIK FRED M.