Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 18:25:59 (UTC).

CENTURION CAPITAL CORPORATION VS. BENNETT, WENDY

Case Summary

On 04/27/2006 CENTURION CAPITAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BENNETT, WENDY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LLOYD NASH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0508

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LLOYD NASH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTURION CAPITAL CORPORATION

Defendant

BENNETT WENDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLPOFF & ABRAMSON, LLP - MARJAN ALITALAEI ESQ

Attorney at WOLPOFF & ABRAMSON, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2008
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/16/08 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2007
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CENTURION CAPITAL CORPORATION) FOR REJECTION OF DISMISSAL. DISMISSAL ALREADY FILED 11-15-06. SUBMITTED ON 01/12/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION/DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY LLOYD NASH, SITE JUDGE . MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PER CRC RULE 201.7(B). SHOULD PROOF OF SERVICE BE FILED PRIOR TO THE OSC, THE HEARING WILL BE PLACED OFF CALENDAR. . HEARING ON 11/17/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 004 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2006
  • DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (CENTURION CAPITAL CORPORATION) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW240853007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • NOTICE RE: CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/06 AT 08:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/27/06

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURION CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALITALAEI MARIAN