Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2018 at 08:33:42 (UTC).

CASHCALL, INC. VS SANDOVAL, STEPHEN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 CASHCALL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANDOVAL, STEPHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEE GRANT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0909

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEE GRANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE & WHITLEY GROUP LLC

Defendant

SANDOVAL STEPHEN

Assignee

WHITE & WHITLEY GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

KENOSIAN JOHN P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016690 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Updated -- WHITE & WHITLEY GROUP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Assignee): Organization Name changed from (WHITE & WHITLEY GROUP, LLC) to WHITE & WHITLEY GROUP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Address for WHITE & WHITLEY GROUP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Assignee) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: JOHN P KENOSIAN (Attorney); Interest: 1,389.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. WRIT PLACED IN S.A.S.E. . RECEIPT # DOW402835012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 777.39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LEE GRANT, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING ELIZABETH GALLARDO . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT STEPHEN SANDOVAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (CASHCALL, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 0000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (SANDOVAL, STEPHEN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SANDOVAL, STEPHEN) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/30/12 AT 02:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . COSTS OF $ 22.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 01/30/12 AT 02:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # DOW511051005 . HEARING SET FOR 12/12/11 AT 02:30P M, IN DEPT. 001

    Read MoreRead Less