This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2016 at 21:08:34 (UTC).

CARLSON INDUSTRIES LLC VS AN, HOJUNG

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 CARLSON INDUSTRIES LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against AN, HOJUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0672

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLSON INDUSTRIES LLC

Defendant

AN HOJUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN & EL DABE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2014
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • OSC SET 08/30/11, 0830 AM, DEPT. CLK, RM 118 NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.