This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2016 at 20:45:51 (UTC).

CAREY, DIANE B VS BEETLEY, MARIA

Case Summary

On 04/11/2008 CAREY, DIANE B filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEETLEY, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8545

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREY DIANE B

Defendant

BEETLEY MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAREY, DIANE B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2011
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • A/C NSF RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • A/C NSF RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • NSF - CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • COMPLAINT IS VOIDED AND DISPOSED PURSUANT TO C.C.P.411.20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • NSF - CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING FEES REQUIRED (MAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • NSF RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2008
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2008
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/08, IN DEPT 80 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less