This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2016 at 10:55:53 (UTC).

CARDENAS, MARLENE VS. SAV-ON DRUGS

Case Summary

On 11/29/2007 CARDENAS, MARLENE filed an Other lawsuit against SAV-ON DRUGS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL M. DUGGAN and MARION J. JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5255

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL M. DUGGAN

MARION J. JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARDENAS MARLENE BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM LORIA MARIA

Defendants

SAV-ON DRUGS INC.

ELEVEN WESTERN BUILDERS INC.

Cross Plaintiff

AMERICAN DRUG STORES INC DBA SAV ON DRUGS

Cross Defendant

LORIA EMMA ESTHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAMON OTERO, JR., INC. - WILLIS J. KING III

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RAMON OTERO, JR., INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTENSEN EHRET LLP - EDWARD E SIPES

Attorney at CHRISTENSEN EHRET LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/07/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CARDENAS, MARLENE), BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, (LORIA, MARIA) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. REASON: COMPLAINT DISMISSED ON 01/23/08. CROSS COMPLAINT ON FILE. SUBMITTED ON 07/01/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. MARION J. JOHNSON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: A SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN REACHED. THE CASE IS SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL ON 8/11/08 AT 8:30AM IN DEPT 2. MIKE HIRSCH IS TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2008
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 08/11/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2008
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: FILING OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2008
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2008
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2007
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (AMERICAN DRUG STORES), INC DBA (SAV ON DRUGS) . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (LORIA, EMMA ESTHER) . RECEIPT # NONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (LORIA, EMMA ESTHER) TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (AMERICAN DRUG STORES), INC DBA (SAV ON DRUGS) FILED. RECEIPT # POM408007007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • DEFENDANT, ELEVEN WESTERN BUILDERS, INC.'S, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CHALLENGE SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND TO RECLASSIFY THE INSTANT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL D. HIRSCH FILED. RECEIPT #POM115119010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • DEPARTMENT R LAW AND MOTION RULINGS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • MINUTES ENTERED 11/21/07 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • CERTIFIED CASE HISTORY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • NOTICE OF RECEIPT ON RECLASSIFIED CASE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/14/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV/DEPT. 002 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 11/29/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • RECEIVED NOTICE OF RULING RE: WALKER MOTION AND TRANSFER OF CASE TO LIMITED JURISDICTION FILED BY POMONA SOUTH COURTHOUSE ON 11/26/07.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Drug Stores LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Eleven Western Builders Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SAV-ON DRUGS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Willis Jackson King, III