Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 07:55:46 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK VS. CARRILLO, ANA

Case Summary

On 07/27/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARRILLO, ANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANA MARIA LUNA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1978

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANA MARIA LUNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANKUSA N.A. SUCCESSOR ININTEREST TO CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

CARRILLO ANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX,LLP - RICHARD E. GOLDEN

Attorney at BLEIER & COX,LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/23/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CAPITAL ONE BANK)USA,N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO (CAPITAL ONE BANK) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: SECTION 2 MUST BE COMPLETED, AS WE HAVE A FEE WAIVER ON FILE FOR DEFENDANT ANA CARRILLO FILED ON 09-17-09. PLEASE COMPLETE AND RESUBMIT. //THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 11/04/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IS VACATED, RESPONSIVE PLEADING HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE REMAINS ON CALENDAR FOR A NON-APPERANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW ON 01/25/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • REQUEST TO OR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (CARRILLO, ANA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (CARRILLO, ANA) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED UNDER CRC RULE 3.55 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CARRILLO, ANA) . RECEIPT # 68511.3 G.C. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RECEIPT # HPK538978013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANA MARIA LUNA, SITE JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/25/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 002 OF HONORABLE ANA MARIA LUNA .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Golden, Richard E