This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 14:21:37 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA VS. YANG, LIN

Case Summary

On 03/26/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YANG, LIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1005

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USAN.A.

Defendant

YANG LIN DBA HOTT COMMUNICATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, PC - ERICA L. BRACHFELD

Attorney at THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, PC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2012
  • CAE FILE RECEIVED FROM POMONA NORTH COURTHOUSE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/01/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (YANG, LIN) DBA (HOTT COMMUNICATION INC) FILED. COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/29/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM505123015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less