This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 03:17:38 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA VS. SYED, IMRAN Z

Case Summary

On 05/11/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SYED, IMRAN Z. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1681

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

SYED IMRAN Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN, LLP - KURTISS A. JACOBS

Attorney at MANN BRACKEN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/21/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. COMMR. ANTHONY PETERS PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: 06-07-10 CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CALENDAR DESK RE: CALENDARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. PRO TEMP WILLIAM BAKER PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 06/07/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 10 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEXT COURT HEARING DATE. IF THE REQUEST IS FILED TIMELY, THEN NO APPEARANCE SHALL BE REQUIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEFAULT JUDGMENT DESK RE: 06-17-09 WORK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (SYED, IMRAN Z) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM448028030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/12/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS KURTISS A.