Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 23:34:25 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA VS. HAN, SILHEE

Case Summary

On 08/06/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAN, SILHEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2790

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

HAN SILHEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES - JANALIE HENRIQUES ESQ

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/09/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA), N.A. FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE. REASON: THIS EXACT DOCUMENT WAS FILED ON 12-17-09. SUBMITTED ON 01/27/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 08/02/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (HAN, SILHEE) . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM001008006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/08/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE