This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 13:23:50 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA VS. GONZALEZ, IGNACIO

Case Summary

On 03/24/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALEZ, IGNACIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM BAKER and ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0938

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BAKER

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

GONZALEZ IGNACIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC. - MARK D WALSH

Attorney at LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/21/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. WILLIAM BAKER PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CALENDAR DESK RE: CALENDARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (GONZALEZ, IGNACIO) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM234074008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/28/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less