This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 16:15:35 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA VS. FIGUEROA, ELMER A

Case Summary

On 04/23/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FIGUEROA, ELMER A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAIME R. CORRAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1138

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

FIGUEROA ELMER A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WOLPOFF & ABR - ANN K. MERRILL

Attorney at THE SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WOLPOFF & ABR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/23/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR THE PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY ANA MARIA LUNA TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 04/19/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA), N.A. FOR REJECTION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT: ATTORNEY'S FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS DO NOT MATCH ORIGINALS FILED. IF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS HAVE CHANGED, A NOTICE OF CHANGE FOR FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS MUST BE SUBMITTED. //THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 10/19/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (FIGUEROA, ELMER A) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN HPK538978085.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 002 OF HONORABLE ANA MARIA LUNA (SITE JUDGE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANA MARIAL LUNA (SITE JUDGE) TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/27/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS (395(B) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less