This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 21:42:42 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA VS. CUN, CHARLENE M

Case Summary

On 07/28/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CUN, CHARLENE M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2654

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendants

CUN CHARLENE M

JUST FLEUR YOU LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC. - MARK D WALSH

Attorney at LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/09/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY COMMR. ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 07/23/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (CUN, CHARLENE M ) . COSTS OF $ 67.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (JUST FLEUR YOU) LLC . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM234074011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC. - MARK D. WALSH