This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 07:27:55 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N.A. VS. CARRERA, MAYRA M.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARRERA, MAYRA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and LIA R. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0471

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

Presiding Judge

LIA R. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

CARRERA MAYRA M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN, LLP - LOURDES R SLINSKY

Attorney at MANN BRACKEN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. COMM. LIA R. MARTIN PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 08/31/09 IS HEREBY VACATED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 02/16/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N.A.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT;CIVIL COVER SHEET;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION;DECLRATION PUR. SEC. 395(B) FILED. SERVED AS TO (CARRERA, MAYRA M.) . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM482668015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(B); VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/31/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.