This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 15:59:58 (UTC).

CANDET PROPERTIES, INC. VS. TRAN, HA THI

Case Summary

On 08/20/2009 CANDET PROPERTIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TRAN, HA THI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0814

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANDET PROPERTIES INC.

Defendants

NGUYEN SUSIE T.

TRAN HA THI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. MA - JOHN JINGSHENG MA ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. MA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. FORWARDED TO EL MONTE SHERIFF DEPARTMENT. . RECEIPT # ELM478900005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 41.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (TRAN, HA THI) . COSTS OF $ .00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (NGUYEN, SUSIE T.) . COSTS OF $ .00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (TRAN, HA THI) , (NGUYEN, SUSIE T.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/26/09 . FOR (CANDET PROPERTIES, INC.) . AGAINST (TRAN, HA THI) , (NGUYEN, SUSIE T.) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3031 JACKSON AVE., ROSEMEAD, CA 91770 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM511049042.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANDET PROPERTIES INC. (DOE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MA JOHN JINGSHENG ESQ.