This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 09:33:19 (UTC).

CAMPBELL, WILLIAM VS. MINAS, FAWZIA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2009 CAMPBELL, WILLIAM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MINAS, FAWZIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPBELL WILLIAM

Defendant

MINAS FAWZIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK

Attorney at DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/18/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK;S NOTICE OF RULING AND/OR APPEALABLE ORDER RETURNED AS TO (MINAS, FAWZIA) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED-UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER CORRECTING JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER: IT APPEARING TO THE COURT THAT THROUGH INADVERTENCE AND CLERICAL ERROR, THE JUDGMENT DATED ON 02/04/09 , DOES NOT PROPERLY REFLECT THE COURT`S ORDER, THEREFORE THE SAID JUDGMENT IS ORDERED CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC AS OF 02/04/09 AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT FOR: CAMPBELL, WILLIAM AGAINST: MINAS, FAWZIA FOR RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 28315 HILLFIELD LANE, #3, CANYON COUNTRY, CA 91351. THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 004 FOR CONSIDERATION NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER AMENDING JUDGMENT TO CORRECT NAME OF PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 02/04/09 , FOR (CAMPBELL, WILLAIM) , AGAINST (MINAS, FAWZIA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 28315 HILLFIELD LANE, #3, CANYON COUNTRY, CA 91351 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AS TO THE ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 20.77 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CAMPBELL, WILLAIM) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - NO ANSWER WAS FILED THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT WAS PROCESSED SUBMITTED ON 01/28/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW517691027 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (MINAS, FAWZIA) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES AT THE TIME OF FILING . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MINAS, FAWZIA) , ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW253967027.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less