This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 07:18:20 (UTC).

CAL-DUCT INC VS. BOOMERANG ENGINEERING INC

Case Summary

On 02/10/2011 CAL-DUCT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOOMERANG ENGINEERING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0186

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAL-DUCT INC

Defendants

BOOMERANG ENGINEERING INC A CALIF CORP

HOLOPAINEN JARI KALEVI INDIVIDUAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/24/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. JOSE A. RODRIGUEZ PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CAL-DUCT INC) FOR REJECTION OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT -YOU MAY ONLY SUBMIT A SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT WHEN THERE IS A JUDGMENT ON FILE. OUR RECORDS SHOW THAT THERE IS NO JUDGMENT ON FILE. SUBMITTED ON 04/19/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 05/02/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (BOOMERANG ENGINEERING INC) A CALIF CORP . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/21/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (HOLOPAINEN, JARI KALEVI) INDIVIDUAL . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/21/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . COSTS OF $ 45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ELM443036002. HEARING SET FOR 03/21/11 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (CAL-DUCT INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL-DUCT INC is a litigant