This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 17:12:15 (UTC).

CAL-DUCT INC VS ASSOCIATED OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 03/12/2010 CAL-DUCT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASSOCIATED OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0419

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAL-DUCT INC

Defendants

ASSOCIATED OF LOS ANGELES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MIROLLA ROBERT V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELM10S00419 TO ALH10SM0419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ .50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # ELM333333002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LIA MARTIN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT . MOTION DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (ASSOCIATED OF LOS ANGELES) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/29/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # ELM511049023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (MIROLLA, ROBERT V) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LIA MARTIN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING (KATHY WALTERS) . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO (ASSOCIATED OF LOS ANGELES) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MIROLLA, ROBERT V) BY SUB-SERVING TERRI CARRASCO OFFICE MANAGER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/21/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 COSTS OF $ 20.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ASSOCIATED OF LOS ANGELES) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BY SUB-SERVING TERR CARRASCO OFFICE MANAGER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/21/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 COSTS OF $ 55.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 05/21/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ASSOCIATED OF LOS ANGELES) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/09/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . COSTS OF $ 20.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MIROLLA, ROBERT V) BY SUB-SERVING DARREN MIROLLA GENERAL MANAGER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/09/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 COSTS OF $ 55.00 . FAULTY SERVICE, SERVED UNTIMELY (LM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ELM511049010. HEARING SET FOR 04/09/10 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (CAL-DUCT INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL-DUCT INC is a litigant