Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 08:49:54 (UTC).

C R G WEST, L.L.C. VS. MAJD, KAM

Case Summary

On 01/31/2007 C R G WEST, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAJD, KAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0021

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C R G WEST L.L.C. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

MAJD KAM AN INDIVIDUAL DBA GLOBAL RESOURCES INC. AN UNKNOWN BU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT A. WILKS - ROBERT A. WILKS ESQ

Attorney at ROBERT A. WILKS

Defendant Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - MARY S JONES

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2008
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2008
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/09/08 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2007
  • ADR CASE REFERRAL INTAKE FORM FILED BY (C R G WEST, L.L.C.), A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2007
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR BY SELECTION OF ADR CLERK OF: SHANNON M. FOLEY ESQ. FILED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MEDIATION MUST BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 08/03/07 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2007
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 08/06/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (C R G WEST, L.L.C.), A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (MAJD, KAM), AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (GLOBAL RESOURCES, INC.), AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2007
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # MAL517212007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2007
  • ANSWER FILED OF (MAJD, KAM), AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (GLOBAL RESOURCES, INC.), AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY . RECEIPT # MAL517212002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; SUPERIOR COURT ADR PROGRAM PACKET AND INFORMATION, BLANK STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN ADR FILED. SERVED AS TO (MAJD, KAM), AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (GLOBAL RESOURCES, INC.), AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY . COSTS OF $ 55.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL517212001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/07 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/01/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKS ROBERT A.