This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 12:09:36 (UTC).

BURNS, KIMBERLIE VS. PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2008 BURNS, KIMBERLIE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JANE GODFREY and MARC JOSEPH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0867

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JANE GODFREY

MARC JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURNS KIMBERLIE

Defendant

PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP LLC COMP OFRICHARDSON CALLIX & ISAKO JULIET

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/21/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL RETURNED AS TO (BURNS, KIMBERLIE) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER. NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 090 , HON. MARC JOSEPH PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 0000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC) COMP OF (RICHARDSON, CALLIX) & (ISAKO, JULIET) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER, NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BURNS, KIMBERLIE) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO POSTPONE REJECTED: FILED BY FAX UNTIMELY. NO TIME TO GIVE NOTICE. SUBMITTED ON 08/27/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC) COMP OF (RICHARDSON, CALLIX) & (ISAKO, JULIET) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JANE GODFREY PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. MOTION GRANTED. MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 10/17/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . GOOD CAUSE. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE AND ORDER TO APPEAR. PARTIES TO BE READY TO PROCEED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2008
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC) COMP OF (RICHARDSON, CALLIX) & (ISAKO, JULIET) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/29/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # LAWPAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 07/07/08 . FOR (BURNS, KIMBERLIE) . AGAINST (PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC) COMP OF (RICHARDSON, CALLIX) & (ISAKO, JULIET) . PRINCIPAL $ 6600.00 . COSTS $ 95.00 . TOTAL $ 6695.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC) COMP OF (RICHARDSON, CALLIX) & (ISAKO, JULIET) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JANE GODFREY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . VENUE PROPER. PROOF OF SERVICE PROPER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC) COMP OF (RICHARDSON, CALLIX) & (ISAKO, JULIET) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/02/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1080512E2744. HEARING SET FOR 07/02/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (PROCUREMENT ACCESS GROUP, LLC) COMP OF (RICHARDSON, CALLIX)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.