This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2018 at 05:37:23 (UTC).

BRENTWOOD ESTATES OWNERS ASSOC VS. HILL, WINFREY HESTER

Case Summary

On 06/12/2008 BRENTWOOD ESTATES OWNERS ASSOC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HILL, WINFREY HESTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK ARIEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1039

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK ARIEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENTWOOD ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

HILL WINFREY HESTER

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/28/2018: Unknown

Served - Order for examination to a Mia Angela Petrarca

10/2/2017: Served - Order for examination to a Mia Angela Petrarca

Served - Order for Examination to a Ali Reza Behjat

10/2/2017: Served - Order for Examination to a Ali Reza Behjat

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/21/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (BRENTWOOD ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. FRANK ARIEL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 0000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2008
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/P0STPONEMENT OF (BRENTWOOD ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION) IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON{S}: YOUR REQUEST WILL BE ATTACHED TO THE CASE FILE FOR THE BENCH OFFICER'S CONSIDERATION ON THE DATE OF HEARING . CASE REMAINS SET ON ORIGINAL HEARING DATE. ALL PARTIES SHOULD BE PRESENT IN COURT ON THAT DATE AND TIME . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (HILL, WINFREY HESTER) BY SUB-SERVING MRS WINFREY HILL - WIFE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/06/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 COSTS OF $ 135.42 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 08/06/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (BRENTWOOD ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION) . AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED FOR KATHLEEN MCDOUGALL, AGENT FOR HOA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.